LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR10
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR10
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR10
Compare Versions
SCR10 Chaptered March 12, 2015
SCR10 Enrolled March 10, 2015
SCR10 Amended February 19, 2015
SCR10 Amended January 27, 2015
SCR10 Introduced January 14, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SCR10 Chaptered March 12, 2015
SCR10 Enrolled March 10, 2015
SCR10 Amended February 19, 2015
SCR10 Amended January 27, 2015
SCR10 Introduced January 14, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare