BILL NUMBER: SCR 10CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 8 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MARCH 12, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE MARCH 9, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 5, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 19, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JANUARY 27, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Huff (Coauthors: Senators Allen, Berryhill, Hall, Hertzberg, Leno, Liu, Mitchell, Morrell, Nguyen, Nielsen, Pan, Stone, Vidak, Wieckowski, and Wolk) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Travis Allen, Baker, Brough, Chang, Chvez, Gallagher, Grove, Hadley, Harper, Kim, Lackey, Linder, Maienschein, Mayes, Melendez, Obernolte, Olsen, Patterson, Wagner, and Waldron) JANUARY 14, 2015 Relative to the Lunar New Year Celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 10, Huff. Lunar New Year Celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year Celebration. WHEREAS, February 19, 2015, will mark the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; and WHEREAS, California is home to over 6 million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, Iu-Mien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; and WHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; and WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by the 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; and WHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is the Year of the Ram and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to feast, to renew family ties, and to start the new year with a clean slate; and WHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the state's rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Members join Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 19, 2015, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year and extend best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the authors for appropriate distribution.