California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2016

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 24, 2016

Amended

Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016