LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR104
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR104
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR104
Compare Versions
SCR104 Chaptered May 24, 2016
SCR104 Enrolled May 19, 2016
SCR104 Amended April 6, 2016
SCR104 Amended March 8, 2016
SCR104 Introduced February 1, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR104 Chaptered May 24, 2016
SCR104 Enrolled May 19, 2016
SCR104 Amended April 6, 2016
SCR104 Amended March 8, 2016
SCR104 Introduced February 1, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare