Senate | 05/04/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3708.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2016 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4502.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/29/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3146.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |