LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR108
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR108
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR108
Compare Versions
SCR108 Chaptered May 4, 2016
SCR108 Enrolled April 29, 2016
SCR108 Amended April 25, 2016
SCR108 Amended April 12, 2016
SCR108 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR108 Chaptered May 4, 2016
SCR108 Enrolled April 29, 2016
SCR108 Amended April 25, 2016
SCR108 Amended April 12, 2016
SCR108 Introduced February 12, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare