Senate | 08/10/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5721.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/01/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4212.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |