California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR138 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/10/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 138CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 100 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 10, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Nielsen (Coauthors: Senators Bates, Berryhill, Cannella, Gaines, Glazer, Hill, Huff, Jackson, Leno, McGuire, Monning, Pavley, Stone, Wieckowski, and Wolk) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bigelow, Dodd, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Hadley, Harper, Levine, Mathis, Olsen, Mark Stone, Williams, and Wood) MAY 5, 2016 Relative to state park rangers. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 138, Nielsen. State park rangers. This measure would recognize 2016 as the 150-year anniversary of public service and protection of state parks by state park rangers and would encourage the Department of Parks and Recreation, the California State Park Rangers Association, and the California State Parks Anniversary Committee to take all appropriate action to celebrate that anniversary. WHEREAS, Galen Clark was appointed "Guardian" of Yosemite State Park in 1866, at California's first state park, Yosemite, established in 1866 by federal legislation signed by President Abraham Lincoln; and WHEREAS, State park rangers, whose titles have variously been "ranger," "guardian," "warden," "custodian," or "superintendent," have continuously served the public and protected the state parks since that first appointment; and WHEREAS, 2016 will mark the 150-year anniversary of service to the public and protection of state parks by state park rangers; and WHEREAS, The Department of Parks and Recreation, the California State Park Rangers Association, the California State Parks Anniversary Committee, and the State Park and Recreation Commission have formally recognized and are supporting the celebration of the 150-year anniversary; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes and commends state park rangers for their long and faithful service to the public and protection of state parks; and be it further Resolved, That 2016 is recognized as the 150-year anniversary of public service and protection of state parks by state park rangers; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Parks and Recreation, the California State Park Rangers Association, and the California State Parks Anniversary Committee are encouraged to take all appropriate action to celebrate the 150-year anniversary; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.