Senate | 07/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Senate | 07/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2016 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5598.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2016 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4383.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |