California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR146 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/07/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 146CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 80 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 7, 2016 ADOPTED IN SENATE JUNE 16, 2016 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 30, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator McGuire MAY 24, 2016 Relative to California Grown Flower Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 146, McGuire. California Grown Flower Month. This measure would proclaim June 2016 as California Grown Flower Month to recognize and honor the men and women of the California grown flower industry for their dedication and productivity. WHEREAS, California's flower industry dates back to the late 1870s when Theodosia B. Shepherd was inspired to sell calla lilies grown in her garden; and WHEREAS, The industry of selling grown flowers began to flourish and by the turn of the century most towns had at least one florist; and WHEREAS, In 1890, the Domoto family established California's first commercial flower farm in Oakland; and WHEREAS, To this day, California still has a year-round climate that is perfect for growing hundreds of varieties of flowers; and WHEREAS, California flowers are grown across 701 million square feet spanning the distance from the City of San Diego, through the Inland Empire to the coastal City of Carpinteria, and up to the Oregon border; and WHEREAS, Arcata, California, is the largest producing region of fresh cut tulips in the United States and is recognized nationally for its lily and iris production, making Humboldt County a valuable and important source of American Grown Flowers and local jobs; and WHEREAS, Humboldt County is a large flower producer in California and is known for its ideal growing conditions for tulips, lilies, and iris and is also where the legendary Stargazer Lily was originally bred; and WHEREAS, California flower farmers account for approximately 80 percent of all domestically grown flowers in the United States; and WHEREAS, Approximately 50 percent of all California grown flowers are distributed to wholesale and retail customers outside of the state; and WHEREAS, The economic activity of California flower farmers, wholesalers, and retail florists creates nearly 145,665 jobs in the state; and WHEREAS, The total economic impact of business activity created by California grown flower farmers', wholesalers', and retail florists' expenditures in the state is more than $12.2 billion; and WHEREAS, The amount of money generated by the California grown flower industry for additional jobs in the state is more than $12.5 million per day; and WHEREAS, The economic activities of California grown flower farmers, wholesalers, and retail florists generate nearly $1.1 billion in additional taxes; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate for all Californians to recognize our California grown flower farmers, wholesalers, retail florists, and others involved in providing such a bounty to our state and the nation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes and honors the men and women of the California grown flower industry for their dedication and productivity and hereby proclaims the month of June 2016 as California Grown Flower Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.