California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 13, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 30, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016