LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR151
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR151
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR151
Compare Versions
SCR151 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SCR151 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SCR151 Amended August 30, 2016
SCR151 Amended August 19, 2016
SCR151 Introduced June 13, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SCR151 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SCR151 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SCR151 Amended August 30, 2016
SCR151 Amended August 19, 2016
SCR151 Introduced June 13, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare