California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR23 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2015

Amended

Bill June 11, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015