LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR23
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR23
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR23
Compare Versions
SCR23 Chaptered August 26, 2015
SCR23 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SCR23 Amended June 11, 2015
SCR23 Amended May 6, 2015
SCR23 Amended April 21, 2015
SCR23 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SCR23 Chaptered August 26, 2015
SCR23 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SCR23 Amended June 11, 2015
SCR23 Amended May 6, 2015
SCR23 Amended April 21, 2015
SCR23 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare