Senate
|
07/22/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/22/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1983.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2360.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 558.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Block. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 507.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|