California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 20, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2015

Amended

Bill July 13, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015