California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR32 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 16, 2015

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2015

Chaptered

Bill April 27, 2015

Amended

Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015