LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR32
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR32
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR32
Compare Versions
SCR32 Chaptered April 27, 2015
SCR32 Enrolled April 23, 2015
SCR32 Amended April 16, 2015
SCR32 Amended April 8, 2015
SCR32 Introduced March 16, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SCR32 Chaptered April 27, 2015
SCR32 Enrolled April 23, 2015
SCR32 Amended April 16, 2015
SCR32 Amended April 8, 2015
SCR32 Introduced March 16, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare