California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR55 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 26, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015