LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR55
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR55
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR55
Compare Versions
SCR55 Chaptered August 26, 2015
SCR55 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SCR55 Amended July 16, 2015
SCR55 Amended June 19, 2015
SCR55 Introduced May 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SCR55 Chaptered August 26, 2015
SCR55 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SCR55 Amended July 16, 2015
SCR55 Amended June 19, 2015
SCR55 Introduced May 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare