Senate | 08/28/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2204.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2534.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 17). | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1872.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |