California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR64 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/28/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 64CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 147 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 28, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 27, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Pan (Coauthors: Senators Block, Hall, Hertzberg, Huff, Leno, Leyva, Monning, Wieckowski, and Wolk) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Chvez, Chu, Dodd, Cristina Garcia, Gray, and Kim) MAY 19, 2015 Relative to the Americans with Disabilities Act. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 64, Pan. Americans with Disabilities Act. This measure would recognize the 25th anniversary of the Americans with Disabilities Act. WHEREAS, The year 2015 is the 25th anniversary of the Americans with Disabilities Act; and WHEREAS, The Americans with Disabilities Act was signed into law on July 26, 1990; and WHEREAS, The Americans with Disabilities Act is the most comprehensive civil rights bill in history for people with disabilities; and WHEREAS, The Americans with Disabilities Act guarantees equal opportunity and access for Americans with disabilities in employment, state and local government activities, public transportation, public accommodations, and telecommunications; and WHEREAS, The Americans with Disabilities Act supports independence for persons with disabilities and promotes access throughout the entire country; and WHEREAS, The State of California is enriched by the diversity and accomplishments of its citizens with disabilities; and WHEREAS, The 25th anniversary of the Americans with Disabilities Act is a milestone worthy of acknowledgment and celebration; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes the 25th anniversary of the landmark Americans with Disabilities Act and those who have made contributions to ensure equal access and opportunity to all citizens of this state; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.