Senate | 09/04/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2376.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2015 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2570.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 07/14/2015 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1545.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |