LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR71
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR71
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR71
Compare Versions
SCR71 Chaptered September 4, 2015
SCR71 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SCR71 Amended July 15, 2015
SCR71 Amended July 2, 2015
SCR71 Introduced June 1, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SCR71 Chaptered September 4, 2015
SCR71 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SCR71 Amended July 15, 2015
SCR71 Amended July 2, 2015
SCR71 Introduced June 1, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare