California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2016

Chaptered

Bill June 1, 2016

Amended

Bill May 23, 2016
Bill January 12, 2016
Bill January 6, 2016