LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR19
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR19
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR19
Compare Versions
SJR19 Chaptered June 1, 2016
SJR19 Enrolled May 27, 2016
SJR19 Amended May 23, 2016
SJR19 Amended January 12, 2016
SJR19 Amended January 6, 2016
SJR19 Introduced August 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SJR19 Chaptered June 1, 2016
SJR19 Enrolled May 27, 2016
SJR19 Amended May 23, 2016
SJR19 Amended January 12, 2016
SJR19 Amended January 6, 2016
SJR19 Introduced August 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare