Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 189, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5599.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 6523.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4882.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|