LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR26
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR26
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR26
Compare Versions
SJR26 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SJR26 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SJR26 Amended August 17, 2016
SJR26 Amended August 9, 2016
SJR26 Introduced August 3, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SJR26 Chaptered September 9, 2016
SJR26 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SJR26 Amended August 17, 2016
SJR26 Amended August 9, 2016
SJR26 Introduced August 3, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare