Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1752.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 2148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 532.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 406.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2015
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|