California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 6, 2015

Amended

Bill June 25, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015
Bill March 17, 2015