Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2015 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 1488.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |