|
10/14/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 790, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3298.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2709.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1914.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|