|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5280.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1543.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|