California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill June 11, 2018
Bill June 27, 2017
Bill June 5, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017