|
07/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 49, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1528.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1479.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|