|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 525, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6982.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5781.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1938.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|