California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1092 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill June 13, 2018
Bill May 26, 2017