|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3524.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2897.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 6. Page 1916.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|