California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1127 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017