|
08/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6237.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5112.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|