California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2018

Amended

Bill June 7, 2018
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill March 21, 2017