California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1285 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/22/2017

                    Enrolled  August 22, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 13, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 21, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  May 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 19, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1285Introduced by Assembly Member GipsonFebruary 17, 2017 An act to add Section 24301 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1285, Gipson. Alcoholic Beverage Control Act: administrative hearings: records.Existing law, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, requires a record of any administrative hearing of the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control, and if an appeal is made to the Alcoholic Beverage Appeals Board, requires the board to determine the appeal upon the record of the department and upon any briefs authorized to be filed by the parties.Existing law requires proceedings at an administrative hearing to be reported by a stenographic reporter unless there is consent for an electronic report.This bill would prohibit the department from creating a videographic recording of a hearing as a record and provide that a videographic recording is inadmissible in specified hearings.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 24301 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read:24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.

 Enrolled  August 22, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 13, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 21, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  May 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 19, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1285Introduced by Assembly Member GipsonFebruary 17, 2017 An act to add Section 24301 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1285, Gipson. Alcoholic Beverage Control Act: administrative hearings: records.Existing law, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, requires a record of any administrative hearing of the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control, and if an appeal is made to the Alcoholic Beverage Appeals Board, requires the board to determine the appeal upon the record of the department and upon any briefs authorized to be filed by the parties.Existing law requires proceedings at an administrative hearing to be reported by a stenographic reporter unless there is consent for an electronic report.This bill would prohibit the department from creating a videographic recording of a hearing as a record and provide that a videographic recording is inadmissible in specified hearings.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 22, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  July 13, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  August 21, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  May 24, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 19, 2017

Enrolled  August 22, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  July 13, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  August 21, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  May 24, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  April 19, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1285

Introduced by Assembly Member GipsonFebruary 17, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Gipson
February 17, 2017

 An act to add Section 24301 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1285, Gipson. Alcoholic Beverage Control Act: administrative hearings: records.

Existing law, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, requires a record of any administrative hearing of the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control, and if an appeal is made to the Alcoholic Beverage Appeals Board, requires the board to determine the appeal upon the record of the department and upon any briefs authorized to be filed by the parties.Existing law requires proceedings at an administrative hearing to be reported by a stenographic reporter unless there is consent for an electronic report.This bill would prohibit the department from creating a videographic recording of a hearing as a record and provide that a videographic recording is inadmissible in specified hearings.

Existing law, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Act, requires a record of any administrative hearing of the Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control, and if an appeal is made to the Alcoholic Beverage Appeals Board, requires the board to determine the appeal upon the record of the department and upon any briefs authorized to be filed by the parties.

Existing law requires proceedings at an administrative hearing to be reported by a stenographic reporter unless there is consent for an electronic report.

This bill would prohibit the department from creating a videographic recording of a hearing as a record and provide that a videographic recording is inadmissible in specified hearings.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 24301 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read:24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 24301 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read:24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.

SECTION 1. Section 24301 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.

24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.

24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.



24301. The department shall not create a record by videographic recording. Videographic recording of a hearing shall be inadmissible in any proceeding before the Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Board or in any proceeding taken under Section 23090.