California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1285 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill June 19, 2017
Bill May 24, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017