|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 3380.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 5. Page 2752.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 2073.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|