|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/15/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3456.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2822.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1395.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|