California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 6, 2017