|
08/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6201.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 1919.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|