California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2018

Amended

Bill May 7, 2018
Bill June 19, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017