California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1406 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/10/2018

                    Enrolled  August 10, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 14, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 09, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 07, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1406Introduced by Assembly Member GloriaFebruary 17, 2017 An act to amend Sections 17403 and 17517 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1406, Gloria. School facilities: leases of real property.Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used by the school district pursuant to specified provisions of law, and provides that the term of any lease or agreement entered into pursuant to those provisions shall not exceed 40 years.This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used jointly by the school district and a private person, firm, local governmental agency as defined, or corporation. Existing law requires that the term of any lease or agreement entered into by a school district under these provisions not exceed 66 years.This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17403 of the Education Code is amended to read:17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.SEC. 2. Section 17517 of the Education Code is amended to read:17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

 Enrolled  August 10, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 14, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 09, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 07, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1406Introduced by Assembly Member GloriaFebruary 17, 2017 An act to amend Sections 17403 and 17517 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1406, Gloria. School facilities: leases of real property.Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used by the school district pursuant to specified provisions of law, and provides that the term of any lease or agreement entered into pursuant to those provisions shall not exceed 40 years.This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used jointly by the school district and a private person, firm, local governmental agency as defined, or corporation. Existing law requires that the term of any lease or agreement entered into by a school district under these provisions not exceed 66 years.This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  August 10, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 14, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  August 09, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  May 07, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017 Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2017

Enrolled  August 10, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  June 14, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  August 09, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  May 07, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  June 19, 2017
Amended IN  Assembly  April 18, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 1406

Introduced by Assembly Member GloriaFebruary 17, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Gloria
February 17, 2017

 An act to amend Sections 17403 and 17517 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1406, Gloria. School facilities: leases of real property.

Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used by the school district pursuant to specified provisions of law, and provides that the term of any lease or agreement entered into pursuant to those provisions shall not exceed 40 years.This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used jointly by the school district and a private person, firm, local governmental agency as defined, or corporation. Existing law requires that the term of any lease or agreement entered into by a school district under these provisions not exceed 66 years.This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.

Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used by the school district pursuant to specified provisions of law, and provides that the term of any lease or agreement entered into pursuant to those provisions shall not exceed 40 years.

This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.

Existing law authorizes a school district to enter into leases and agreements relating to real property and buildings to be used jointly by the school district and a private person, firm, local governmental agency as defined, or corporation. Existing law requires that the term of any lease or agreement entered into by a school district under these provisions not exceed 66 years.

This bill would increase the maximum term of a lease or agreement entered into pursuant to these provisions to 99 years.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17403 of the Education Code is amended to read:17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.SEC. 2. Section 17517 of the Education Code is amended to read:17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 17403 of the Education Code is amended to read:17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

SECTION 1. Section 17403 of the Education Code is amended to read:

### SECTION 1.

17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.



17403. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

SEC. 2. Section 17517 of the Education Code is amended to read:17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

SEC. 2. Section 17517 of the Education Code is amended to read:

### SEC. 2.

17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.

17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.



17517. The term of a lease or agreement entered into by a school district pursuant to this article shall not exceed 99 years.