Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1843.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 949.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|